VA HB1945 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of motor carriers by DMV; commercial driver's licenses. Revises statutes relating to motor carriers, including requiring DMV to simply notify localities of the issuance of overweight and oversize permits and eliminating the requirement for for-hire contract passenger carriers and irregular-route common carriers to prove public convenience and necessity when applying for a license. The bill also updates Virginia law on commercial driver's licenses to comply with federal requirements. This bill is the same as
Title
Motor carriers; regulation by DMV.
Sponsors
Del. John Cox [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0881) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 881 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-21 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1945ER) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1945H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104553D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104553D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103277D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1140 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2000.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2001.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2011.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2075 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2084 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2096 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2097 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2097.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.44 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2099.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2108.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2132 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2137 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2143 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2144 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2146 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2147 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2151 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 2156 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 668 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 696 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 755 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2259 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2426 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |