VA HB1946 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local cigarette tax; authority of certain counties; use of proceeds for school construction. Authorizes any county to impose a local cigarette tax, provided it uses the revenues to fund the construction or improvement of local elementary or secondary schools. Under current law, only Arlington and Fairfax Counties are authorized to impose a local cigarette tax.
Title
Cigarette tax, local; authority of certain counties, use of proceeds for school construction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103227D |