VA HB1948 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local salt severance license taxes. Authorizes any county or city to levy a license tax on every person engaging in the business of severing salt from the earth at a rate of up to one percent of the fair market value of salt severed within such county or city. All taxes levied pursuant to this section shall be paid to the locality in which the salt is severed. The bill provides requirements for the levying of such tax.
Title
Local salt severance license taxes; authorizes any county or city to levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103252D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3286 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3746 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3959 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |