VA HB1955 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administration and enforcement of cigarette laws. Modifies several provisions relating to the administration and enforcement of Virginia's cigarette laws by prohibiting persons convicted of certain offenses from being authorized holders, requiring the Office of the Attorney General to place on its website a list of individuals ineligible to be an authorized holder, and authorizing additional entities to audit and inspect records of persons receiving, storing, selling, handling, or transporting cigarettes. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission and is identical to
Title
Cigarette laws; administration and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N) (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 68 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0738) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 738 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1955ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (75-Y 20-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (75-Y 20-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-04 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1955ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-03 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 31-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-28 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 9-N) |
2015-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102593D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4206.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1000 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |