VA HB1956 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Control of firearms; permitted events. Authorizes any locality by ordinance to prohibit the possession or carrying of firearms, ammunition, or components or any combination thereof in a public space during a permitted event or an event that would otherwise require a permit. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Firearms, etc.; permitted events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101397D |