VA HB1958 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Campaign finance; political action committees established and administered by investor-owned electric utilities; contribution limitation; special reporting requirement. Prohibits political action committees established and administered by one or more investor-owned electric utilities from making any single contribution, or any combination of contributions, that exceed $500 to any single campaign committee in any one election cycle and requires such political action committees to report any contribution made to a campaign committee by the end of the day following the day the contribution is made. Campaign committees are prohibited from knowingly soliciting or accepting contributions in excess of that limit from such political action committees and are also required to report any contribution knowingly received from such political action committees, regardless of the amount of the contribution or when the contribution is made, by the end of the day following the day of the receipt of the contribution. The bill prohibits investor-owned electric utilities that have not established and are not acting as a political action committee in accordance with law from making any contributions to campaign committees.
Title
Campaign finance; political action committees established by investor-owned electric utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102636D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 947.3:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 949.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |