VA HB1962 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Toll violation notice. Sets out the procedures for issuance of toll violation notices.
Title
Toll violations; sets out procedures for issuance of notices.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736) | |
2011-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1962ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 11-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105365D-S1 (86-Y 11-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1962S1 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105365D-S1 | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of dispensing with constitutional reading agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reconsideration of passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed, passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105365D-S1 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 1-N 1-A) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1962H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104714D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104714D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (16-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103731D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |