VA HB1962 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Court adoption of jails. Clarifies that when a county or city is without an adequate jail the court can adopt a regional jail until it can obtain an adequate jail. Currently the statute provides for the adoption of the jail of another county or city in such circumstances without specifying regional jails.
Title
Jails; court can adopt regional jail until it can obtain adequate facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-06 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102357D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1962 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1962+hil |