VA HB1962 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (5-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (5-Y 9-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Local school board members; professional development. Adds additional topics to the professional development activities required of local school board members and requires members to certify their compliance annually with the clerk of the school board. The bill requires the local clerk to record individual members' compliance at the first school board meeting of the year. The bill also directs the Board of Education, in conjunction with the Virginia School Boards Association, to establish criteria for the professional development and training of local school board members. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2016.
Title
School board members, local; professional development activities requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (5-Y 9-N) (Y: 5 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) (Y: 100 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Education and Health (5-Y 9-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 2-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101931D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1962E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101931D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 77 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |