VA HB1964 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meeting exemption for the Fort Monroe Authority. Creates an exemption from the open meeting requirements of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act for discussion or consideration by the Board of Trustees of the Fort Monroe Authority of matters relating to specific gifts, bequests, and grants from private sources. This bill is identical to SB 1090.
Title
Freedom of Information Act; Fort Monroe Authority, closed meeting exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2019-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 15, 2019 | |
2019-02-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 8, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1964ER) |
2019-02-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102032D |