VA HB1966 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Statewide Building Code; enforcement by local building departments. Requires any fees that are levied by a local governing body in order to defray the cost of Building Code enforcement and appeals, with the exception of the levy imposed for the support of training programs of the Building Code Academy, be used only to support the functions of the local building department. The bill also requires local building departments, when denying an application for the issuance of a building permit, to provide to the applicant a written explanation detailing the reasons for which the application was denied. The bill provides that the applicant may submit a revised application addressing the reasons for which the application was previously denied and that, if the applicant does so, the local building department shall be encouraged, but not required, to limit its review of the revised application to only those portions of the application that were previously deemed inadequate and that the applicant has revised.
Title
Uniform Statewide Building Code; issuance of building permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1966ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1966H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105113D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105113D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101136D |