VA HB1970 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine services; coverage. Requires insurers, corporations, or health maintenance organizations to cover medically necessary remote patient monitoring services as part of their coverage of telemedicine services to the full extent that these services are available. The bill defines remote patient monitoring services as the delivery of home health services using telecommunications technology to enhance the delivery of home health care, including monitoring of clinical patient data such as weight, blood pressure, pulse, pulse oximetry, blood glucose, and other condition-specific data; medication adherence monitoring; and interactive video conferencing with or without digital image upload. The bill requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to include in the state plan for medical assistance services a provision for the payment of medical assistance for medically necessary health care services provided through telemedicine services. This bill is identical to SB 1221.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine services; payment and coverage of services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1970ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-11SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1970H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105496D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105496D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102304D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.16(n/a)See Bill Text
5412901(n/a)See Bill Text
5412903(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1970
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1970+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1970H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1970ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0211+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0011+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0050+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2145+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2219+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0189+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1970+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1970+HB1970
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2791+HB1970

Bill Comments

feedback