VA HB1971 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health professions and facilities; adverse action in another jurisdiction. Provides that the mandatory suspension of a license, certificate, or registration of a health professional by the Director of the Department of Health Professions is not required when the license, certificate, or registration of a health professional is revoked, suspended, or surrendered in another jurisdiction based on disciplinary action or mandatory suspension in the Commonwealth. The bill extends the time by which the Board of Pharmacy (Board) is required to hold a hearing after receiving an application for reinstatement from a nonresident pharmacy whose registration has been suspended by the Board based on revocation or suspension in another jurisdiction from not later than its next regular meeting after the expiration of 30 days from receipt of the reinstatement application to not later than its next regular meeting after the expiration of 60 days from receipt of the reinstatement application.
Title
Health professions and facilities; adverse action in another jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138) | |
2019-02-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1971ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101778D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3434.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |