VA HB1984 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Legal holidays; Election Day. Designates Election Day, the Tuesday after the first Monday in November, as a state holiday and removes Lee-Jackson Day as a state holiday.
Title
Legal holidays; Election Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102233D |