VA HB1997 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public elementary and secondary school students; protective orders; notification. Requires any school principal who receives notice that a circuit court, general district court, juvenile and domestic relations court, or magistrate has issued a protective order for the protection of a child who is enrolled at a public elementary or secondary school where such principal is employed, or any other order prohibiting contact with such a child, including an order issued as a condition of pretrial or posttrial supervision, to subsequently notify certain school personnel that such order has been issued. The bill also requires the Board of Education to establish guidelines and develop model policies to aid school boards in the implementation of such notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public elementary and secondary school students; protective orders, notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1997ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1997H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105968D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105968D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102569D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221279.3:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1997
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1997+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1997H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1997ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0579+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0056+HB1997
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0108+HB1997
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2358+HB1997
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0249+HB1997
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1997+HB1997
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1997+HB1997

Bill Comments

feedback