VA HB2007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Eviction; writs of possession and eviction. Changes the terminology from writ of possession to writ of eviction for the writ executed by a sheriff to recover real property pursuant to an order of possession. The bill specifies that an order of possession remains effective for 180 days after being granted by the court and clarifies that any writ of eviction not executed within 30 days of its issuance shall be vacated as a matter of law, and no further action shall be taken by the clerk. As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Housing Commission and is identical to SB 1448.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eviction; writs of possession and eviction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0700)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 700 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2007ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106366D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2007S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106366D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106366D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HousePrinted as engrossed 19101174D-E
2019-01-22HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2007E
2019-01-22HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101174D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16169.40(n/a)See Bill Text
171272(n/a)See Bill Text
5813947(n/a)See Bill Text
801128(n/a)See Bill Text
801129(n/a)See Bill Text
801293(n/a)See Bill Text
801470(n/a)See Bill Text
801471(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2007
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2007+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2007E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2007S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2007ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0700+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0001+HB2007
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0036+HB2007
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1790+HB2007
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0119+HB2007
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2007+HB2007
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2007+HB2007
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2901+HB2007

Bill Comments

feedback