VA HB2015 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; mitigating risk of improper payments; report. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to conduct a pilot program to develop and implement means to mitigate the risk of improper payments to providers of services furnished under the state plan for medical assistance and all applicable waivers. The bill also requires that the Department's selection of a vendor for the operation of the pilot program be dependent on the demonstration of a proof of concept. The bill requires the Department to report to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and the Senate Committee on Finance (i) by August 1, 2019, on its progress in designing and implementing the pilot program and (ii) by February 1, 2020, on the pilot program's effectiveness in mitigating
Title
Fraud prevention; DMAS to expand its existing program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0422) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 422 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2015ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19105101D-EH1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2015EH1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments from Appropriations agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute from HWI agreed to 19105101D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105101D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101826D |