VA HB2028 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislation increasing or beginning regulation of an occupation; evaluation required. Provides that when any legislative bill requiring the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation to increase or begin regulation of an occupation is filed during any session of the General Assembly, the Board for Professional and Occupational Regulation shall prepare an evaluation of the legislation using criteria outlined in current law that the Board is required to use whenever the Board determines that a particular occupation should be regulated or that a different degree of regulation should be imposed on a currently regulated occupation.
Title
Occupation; legislation increasing or beginning regulation, evaluation required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0812) | |
2019-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 812 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2028ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (90-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (90-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101677D |