VA HB2029 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; definition of resident estate or trust. For income tax purposes, changes the definition of "resident estate or trust" to no longer include an estate or trust which is being administered in the Commonwealth.
Title
Income tax, state; changes definition of resident estate or trust.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103053D |