VA HB2045 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; certification of recovery residences; regulations; civil penalties. Provides for the promulgation of regulations for the certification of recovery residences by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill defines "recovery residence" as a housing facility that provides alcohol-free and illicit-drug-free housing to individuals with substance abuse disorders and individuals with co-occurring mental illnesses and substance abuse disorders that does not include clinical treatment services. The bill prohibits any person from advertising, representing, or otherwise implying to the public that a recovery residence or other housing facility is a certified recovery residence unless it is certified by the Department. The bill authorizes the Department to assess a civil penalty for violations of this prohibition. Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services; certification of recovery residences; regulations; civil penalties. Provides for the promulgation of regulations for the certification of recovery residences by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services. The bill defines "recovery residence" as a housing facility that provides alcohol-free and illicit-drug-free housing to individuals with substance abuse disorders and individuals with co-occurring mental illnesses and substance abuse disorders that does not include clinical treatment services. The bill prohibits any person from advertising, representing, or otherwise implying to the public that a recovery residence or other housing facility is a certified recovery residence unless it is certified by the Department. The bill authorizes the Department to assess a civil penalty for violations of this prohibition.
Title
Recovery residences; certification by Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0220) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 220 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2045ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2045H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105077D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105077D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101781D |