VA HB2047 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Communicated to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 18 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Communicated to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Long-term health care insurance tax credit. Repeals the long-term health care insurance tax credit for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2014. The bill would not repeal the income tax deduction for long-term health care insurance premiums paid by an individual.
Title
Long-term health care insurance; tax credit not allowed if person claimed fed. income tax deduction.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 66-N) (Y: 30 N: 67 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N) (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2013-04-03 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 66-N) |
2013-04-03 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (29-Y 66-N) |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's substitute printed 13105696D-H1 |
2013-03-25 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2047ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 13101876D-E |
2013-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2047E |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (15-Y 6-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: #3 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101876D |