VA HB2052 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Charter; City of Richmond; runoff elections. Provides that the procedures and deadlines for voter registration, applying for an absentee ballot, and casting an absentee ballot for any runoff election in the City of Richmond shall be as provided under state law for general elections. This bill is identical to SB 1193.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Richmond, City of; amending charter, runoff elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0306)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 306 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2052ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2052H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105134D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105134D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101982D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2052
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2052+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2052H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2052ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0306+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0701V0011+HB2052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0015+HB2052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2070+HB2052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0067+HB2052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2052+HB2052
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2052+HB2052

Bill Comments

feedback