VA HB2058 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Remote access to land records; fee; exemption for certain state agencies. Exempts the Department of General Services, the Department of Conservation and Recreation, the Department of Forestry, and the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority from paying any fee for remote access to land records. The bill also provides that if a clerk of the circuit court who provides secure remote access to land records contracts with an outside vendor to provide such remote access to subscribers, such contract shall contain a provision exempting the Department of General Services, the Department of Conservation and Recreation, the Department of Forestry, and the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority from paying any access or subscription fee. The bill further provides that when an agreement for such remote access is made between a state agency and the clerk or an outside vendor, the agreement shall provide that the state agency is required to monitor its employees' activity under such agreement to ensure compliance with its terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Remote access to land records; fee, Department of General Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2058ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 19106585D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2058S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106585D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106585D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 19101871D-E
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2058E
2019-01-29HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101871D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171276(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2058
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2058+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2058E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2058S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2058ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0611+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0011+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0057+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1971+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2017+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0130+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2058+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2058+HB2058
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2903+HB2058

Bill Comments

feedback