VA HB2060 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real estate with delinquent taxes or liens; appointment of special commissioner; increase required value. Increases the required assessed value of property for the purpose of a locality appointing a special commissioner to convey property with delinquent taxes or liens to the locality in lieu of sale at public auction (i) from $100,000 to $150,000 in Norfolk, Richmond, Hopewell, Newport News, Petersburg, Fredericksburg, and Hampton and (ii) from $50,000 to $75,000 in all other localities.
Title
Real estate with delinquent taxes or liens; appointment of special commissioner, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 10-N) (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) (Y: 80 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0541) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 541 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2060ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (33-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-21 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Lucas, Stuart, Vogel |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | Delegates: Carr, Hugo, McNamara |
2019-02-15 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-15 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N 1-A) |
2019-02-12 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 98-N 1-A) |
2019-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (28-Y 10-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (11-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 17-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101861D |