VA HB2062 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections administration; pre-election and post-election activities. Makes technical amendments to certain pre-election and post-election activities, including voter registration, voting system requirements in polling places, and recounts, that reflect the administrative reorganization of the Department of Elections (the Department) that took effect July 1, 2014. The bill also requires confirmation documents, instead of voter registration cards, to notify voters of changes in registration records and polling places and reassigns the duty of posting recount changes to the Department. The Department is also added to the list of entities that may advise a court during a recount. The bill also requires that a precinct having more than 4,000 registered voters be provided with no less than two ballot scanner machines at a presidential election, but provides an exception for localities that determine that a second scanner is not necessary at a particular precinct on the basis of voter turnout and the average voter wait time in previous presidential elections.
Title
Elections administration; pre-election and post-election activities.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Michael Futrell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed by for the day (0-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 740 (effective 7/1/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB2062ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2062ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101824D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2062E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (20-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101824D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 404.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 404.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 411.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 413 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 418.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 420.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 424 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 427 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 428 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 444 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 627 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 679 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |