VA HB2073 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; happy hour advertising. Expands the ability of retail on-premises licensees to advertise happy hours by allowing them to advertise the prices of featured alcoholic beverages and to use creative marketing techniques, provided that such techniques do not tend to induce overconsumption or consumption by minors. This bill is identical to SB 1726.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; happy hour advertising.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0029) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 29 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2073ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (37-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2073H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104490D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104490D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102576D |