VA HB2075 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; occupational disease presumptions. Adds correctional officers and full-time sworn members of the enforcement division of the Department of Motor Vehicles to the list of public safety employees who are entitled to a presumption that hypertension and heart disease are occupational diseases compensable under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act. The measure also adds correctional officers to the list of public safety employees who are entitled to a presumption that certain infectious diseases are compensable occupational diseases.
Title
Workers' compensation; occupational disease presumptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104800D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103824D |