VA HB2078 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forfeiture on recognizance; bail bondsman; suspension of license. Provides that if a forfeited recognizance is not paid within 150 days, the license of any bail bondsman on the bond shall be suspended by the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) until the forfeiture is satisfied. The bill further provides that the court will then give notice to any employer of the bail bondsman on the bond to pay the forfeited recognizance within 10 business days. If such forfeited recognizance is not paid at the end of 10 business days, the bill provides that the Department shall suspend the licenses of such employer of the bail bondsman and agents thereof until the forfeited recognizance is satisfied.
Title
Forfeiture on recognizance; bail bondsman, suspension of license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0200) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 200 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2078ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2078H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105179D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105179D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101500D |