VA HB2079 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; decriminalization of simple marijuana possession; penalty. Decriminalizes marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $50 for a first violation, $100 for a second violation, and $250 for a third or subsequent violation. Under current law, a first offense is punishable by a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum jail sentence of 30 days, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill creates a rebuttable presumption that a person who possesses no more than one-half ounce of marijuana possesses it for personal use and provides that the existing suspended sentence and substance abuse screening provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a minor. The bill decreases the penalty for distribution or possession with intent to sell more than one-half ounce but not more than five pounds of marijuana from a Class 5 felony to a Class 6 felony.
Title
Marijuana; decriminalization of simple possession, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. David Toscano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100101D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 287.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |