VA HB2104 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public elementary and secondary schools; dress or grooming codes. Requires any dress or grooming code, which the bill defines as any practice, policy, or portion of a code of student conduct adopted by a school board that governs or restricts the attire of any enrolled student, to (i) permit any student to wear any religiously, ethnically, or culturally specific or significant head covering or hairstyle, including hijabs, yarmulkes, headwraps, braids, dreadlocks, and cornrows; (ii) maintain gender neutrality by subjecting any student to the same set of rules and standards regardless of gender; (iii) be clear, specific, and objective and avoid any subjective term or standard such as "distracting," "provocative," or "inappropriate"; (iv) prohibit any school board employee from enforcing the dress or grooming code by direct physical contact with a student or a student's attire; and (v) prohibit any school board employee from requiring a student to undress in front of any other individual, including the enforcing school board employee, to comply with the dress or grooming code. The bill requires the Board of Education to include in its guidelines and model policies for codes of student conduct standards for dress or grooming codes.
Title
Public elementary and secondary schools; dress or grooming codes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103700D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 276.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |