VA HB2107 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; parental review of certain anti-bullying and suicide prevention materials. Requires local school boards to develop and implement policies that ensure parents the right to review any audio-visual materials that contain graphic sexual or violent content used in any anti-bullying or suicide prevention program. Such policies shall require that prior to using any such material, the parent of the child participating in such a program shall be provided written notice of his right to review the material and his right to excuse his child from participating in the part of such program utilizing such material.
Title
Public schools; parental review of certain anti-bullying and suicide prevention materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0581) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 581 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2107ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104206D |