VA HB2116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Powers and duties of the Commissioner of Highways and the Commonwealth Transportation Board. Amends the powers and duties of the Commissioner of Highways and the Commonwealth Transportation Board to create new efficiencies and streamline procedures by granting the Commissioner greater authority over administrative operations, matters involving the practice of civil engineering, and interaction with stakeholders.
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Board, Commissioner of Highways, etc.; powers and duties, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2116ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (10-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2116H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104544D-H1 |
2013-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104544D-H1 |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #4 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101417D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1209 (Same As) 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0646)
Subjects
Administration of Government
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Motor Vehicles
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Motor Vehicles
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2108.23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 555 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 13.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 183.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 190.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 196 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 229 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.03:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 23.5:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 293 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 342 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 370 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 56 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 61 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 69.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 89.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1041 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1046 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 831 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 847 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 878.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 889 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 924 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
5 | 1 | 49 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 56 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |