VA HB2124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restaurants; licensure fee. Provides that the State Board of Health shall establish in its regulations licensure fees for restaurants, which shall be based on the size of the restaurant and the amount of the restaurant's annual gross receipts from the sale of food prepared on the premises.
Title
Restaurants; State Board of Health to establish licensure fee based on size & annual gross receipts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in General Laws | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102854D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Health
Hotels, Restaurants, Summer Camps, and Campgrounds
Health
Hotels, Restaurants, Summer Camps, and Campgrounds
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2124 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2124+hil |