VA HB2124 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Following too closely. Prohibits operators of any vehicle (not only motor vehicles) from following any other vehicle (not only motor vehicles) more closely than is reasonable.
Title
Following too closely; operator of any vehicle shall not get closer than than is reasonable.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #2 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102002D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2124 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2124+hil |