VA HB2124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eminent domain; just compensation for entry onto property. Provides that a condemnor or a natural gas company with the right of entry without the permission of the landowner must provide just compensation to the landowner for such entry. The bill provides that the presumptive amount of such just compensation is $100, which shall be paid to the landowner in advance of the entry onto the property.
Title
Eminent domain; just compensation for entry onto property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2017-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103364D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2124 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2124+hil |