VA HB2125 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; alternative pathway to the advanced studies diploma. Directs the Board of Education to establish a pathway to the advanced studies high school diploma that requires advanced coursework in career and technical education in lieu of world language coursework and any other required course that the Board deems appropriate. The bill requires such pathway to become effective for the 2020-2021 school year and to be available to any student, regardless of the school year during which the student enters ninth grade.
Title
Education, Board of; alternative pathway to the advanced studies diploma.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103793D |