VA HB213 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1154)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification; student identification card issued by out-of-state institution of higher education. Adds to the list of acceptable forms of voter identification a valid student photo identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in any other state or territory of the United States. Current law allows students from any institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth to use their student photo identification cards for purposes of voting.
Title
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification, out-of-state student identification card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1154) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1154 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB213ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (10-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 41-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101656D |