VA HB2130 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Election laws; time off to vote. Requires employers to give their employees sufficient time off to vote, which shall be either before the employees' shifts begin or after their shifts end, unless otherwise agreed to by the employer and employee. The employer is required to pay employees for up to two hours of time off to vote. The bill requires the employee to give at least three days' notice of his intention to take voting leave and requires employers to post notice of the provisions of the bill at least 10 days prior to every election.
Title
Election laws; time off to vote.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103657D |