VA HB2131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax credit for low-income seniors. Establishes in taxable years 2019 through 2023 a $1,000 refundable income tax credit for taxpayers age 65 or older with household income less than 138 percent of the applicable amount in the federal poverty guidelines. If more than one person in a household is eligible for the credit, only one such person may claim the credit.
Title
Income tax, state; credit for low-income seniors.
Sponsors
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100812D |