VA HB2133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Department of Emergency Management; annual reporting requirements; Virginia Comprehensive Emergency Management Report. Eliminates the Virginia Department of Emergency Management's requirement to submit an annual Commonwealth Threat and Hazard Identification and Risk Assessment (C-THIRA) to the Governor and General Assembly. The bill also consolidates other additional annual reporting requirements into one annual tabulated report called the Virginia Comprehensive Emergency Management Report, which shall be submitted by the State Coordinator of Emergency Management to the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Chairmen of the Senate Committee on Finance, the Senate Committee for Courts of Justice, the House Committee on Appropriations, and the House Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety by November 1 of each year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Management, Virginia Department of; annual reporting requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0615)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 615 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2133ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 19102200D-E
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2133E
2019-01-30HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102200D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22222.1(n/a)See Bill Text
22222.3(n/a)See Bill Text
22613(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2133
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2133+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2133E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2133ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0615+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0014+HB2133
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0014+HB2133
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0018+HB2133
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2073+HB2133
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0143+HB2133
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2133+HB2133
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2133+HB2133

Bill Comments

feedback