VA HB2136 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Evidence; accident reconstruction; criminal cases. Provides that in any criminal case, an accident reconstruction expert, when properly qualified, may testify as an expert witness in a court of law subject to the Rules of Supreme Court.
Title
Evidence; accident reconstruction, criminal cases.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Thomas [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N) (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (5-Y 10-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2136H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104837D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104837D-H1 |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100742D |