VA HB2144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Duty-Free Lunch Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the Duty-Free Lunch Grant Fund and Program for the purpose of awarding grants on a competitive basis to school boards to provide teachers in the local school division with an uninterrupted lunch period during which they have no instructional, administrative, or other duties to perform. The bill requires the Department of Education to administer the Program and to establish such guidelines and procedures as it deems necessary for the administration of the Program, including guidelines and procedures for grant applications, awards, and renewals.
Title
Duty-Free Lunch Grant Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101975D |