VA HB2145 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Model exit questionnaire for teachers; statewide implementation. Requires each local school board to (i) administer the model exit questionnaire for teachers developed by the Superintendent of Public Instruction to each teacher who ceases to be employed in the school division for any reason and (ii) collect, maintain, and report on the results of each such questionnaire in a manner that ensures the confidentiality of each teacher's name and other personally identifying information. Under current law, such model exit questionnaire for teachers is administered in five school divisions pursuant to a pilot program.
Title
Teachers; model exit questionnaire, statewide implementation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105857D-H1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101979D |