VA HB2147 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Standards for Accreditation; review and corrective action. Aligns the state review process of underperforming schools and school divisions with the new Standards for Accreditation adopted by the Board of Education (Board). The bill requires the Board to establish a review process to assist schools not meeting the standards established by the Board. The Board shall establish a corrective action plan process for any such school within its division, including a requirement that each school board submit a corrective action plan for any school in the local school division that does not meet the established standards. The bill requires a school board of a school division that does not demonstrate progress in developing or implementing such corrective action plan to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the Board. The bill also requires the school board of an underperforming school division to enter into a memorandum of understanding with the Board prior to developing a corrective action plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards for Accreditation; review and corrective action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0585)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 585 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2147ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2147H1
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105860D-H1
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105860D-H1
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 1-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102085D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2147
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2147+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2147H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2147ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0585+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0029+HB2147
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0061+HB2147
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2113+HB2147
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0252+HB2147
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2147+HB2147
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2147+HB2147

Bill Comments

feedback