VA HB2153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Small Business Financing Authority; Virginia Small Business Emergency Bridge Loan Fund created. Creates the Virginia Small Business Emergency Bridge Loan Fund (the Fund) to provide short-term direct loans to eligible small businesses adversely affected by a disaster for which a state of emergency has been declared. The bill provides that the Fund shall be managed and administered by the Small Business Financing Authority with guidance from the Director of the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity and in coordination with the Virginia Department of Emergency Management. The bill also provides that loans provided from the Fund shall be (i) for a minimum amount of $1,000 up to a maximum amount of $10,000, (ii) provided interest-free, and (iii) repaid by the end of the loan term, which term shall be set by the Authority for a minimum of 90 days but not to exceed 180 days.
Title
Virginia Small Business Emergency Bridge Loan Fund; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100670D |