VA HB2154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Stormwater management; grandfathered land-disturbing activities. Authorizes any land-disturbing activity that is eligible to take place pursuant to technical criteria that were adopted by the State Water Control Board prior to July 1, 2014, to be governed by such criteria until July 1, 2024. Current regulations grandfather such activities until July 1, 2019.
Title
Stormwater management; grandfathered land-disturbing activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104017D |