VA HB2158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dispensing of naloxone. Expands the list of individuals who may dispense naloxone pursuant to a standing order to include health care providers providing services in hospital emergency departments and emergency medical services personnel and eliminates certain requirements. The bill establishes requirements for the dispensing of naloxone in an injectable formulation with a hypodermic needle or syringe. The bill also allows a person who dispenses naloxone on behalf of an organization to charge a fee for the dispensing of naloxone, provided that the fee is no greater than the cost to the organization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Naloxone; expands list of individuals who may dispense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0221)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 221 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2158ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2158H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106091D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106091D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104132D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2158
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2158+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2158H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2158ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0221+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0014+HB2158
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0060+HB2158
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2150+HB2158
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2224+HB2158
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0217+HB2158
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2158+HB2158
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2158+HB2158

Bill Comments

feedback