VA HB2167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Deposition of corporate officer. Provides that when an officer, as defined in the bill, who is called as a deposition witness files a motion for a protective order because the discovery sought by the deposition is obtainable from some other source that is more convenient, less burdensome, or less expensive, the burden is on the party seeking the deposition to defeat such a motion by showing that (i) the officer's deposition is reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence, (ii) the officer may have personal knowledge of discoverable information that cannot be discovered through other means, and (iii) a deposition of a representative other than the officer or other methods of discovery are unsatisfactory, insufficient, or inadequate. This bill is identical to SB 1457.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate officer; deposition witness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
2019-02-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-06 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 13, 2019
2019-02-06HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 6, 2019
2019-02-05SenateSigned by President
2019-02-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2167ER)
2019-02-05HouseEnrolled
2019-02-04SenatePassed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2019-02-04SenateRead third time
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 3-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19103758D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2167E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103758D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801420.4:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2167
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2167+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2167E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2167ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0009+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0008+HB2167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0040+HB2167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1865+HB2167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0199+HB2167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0310HB2167+HB2167
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0318HB2167+HB2167

Bill Comments

feedback