VA HB2172 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional release of geriatric prisoners; exceptions. Prohibits persons serving a sentence imposed upon a conviction of murder in the first degree, abduction with the intent to defile, abduction of any child under 16 for the purpose of concubinage or prostitution, abduction of any minor for the purpose of manufacturing child pornography, rape, forcible sodomy, object sexual penetration, aggravated sexual battery, crimes against nature involving family members, adultery or fornication involving family members, or taking indecent liberties with a child or a conviction of the production, publication, sale, or financing of child pornography from petitioning the Parole Board for conditional release, under current law, when such persons reach age 65 and have served at least five years of their sentence or reach age 60 and have served at least 10 years of their sentence.
Title
Geriatric prisoners; conditional release, exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105421D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100876D |