VA HB2180 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Semiconductor Manufacturing Grant Fund; creation. Creates the Semiconductor Manufacturing Grant Fund for the award of grants to a qualified semiconductor manufacturing company that makes a capital investment of at least $2.98 billion in a qualified locality and creates and maintains at least 1,106 new jobs with an average annual wage of at least $92,000. Such a qualified company would be eligible to receive a grant of $50 million in fiscal year 2020 and a grant of $20 million in fiscal year 2021, subject to total or partial recapture if the qualified company does not meet the performance metrics agreed to in a memorandum of understanding with the Commonwealth. This bill is identical to SB 1370.
Title
Semiconductor Manufacturing Grant Fund; created.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] | Del. Matthew James [D] |
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Charles Poindexter [R] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2180ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102237D |